flipkart app

App

flipkart app

App

flipkart app

App

Sunday, 6 October 2013

Vedic Maths : Lesson 5 (Multiply Easily) :: MULTIPLICATION OF 9

MULTIPLICATION OF 9

Step1
 Prefix 0 before multiplicand

Step2 Take last digit, subtract it from 10 and write it at the extreme right

Step3 Take second last digit add one and subtract it from last digit write before step 1 figure

Step4 Now move toward left take third last digit and subtract it from right neighbor
          write before step 2 figure and repeat it up to first digit i.e 0

                                                            

                                                             123456 x9 = ??

0123456x9 =

Here subtract 6 from 10 ( 10-6=4 ) write 4 at the extreme right ...............................................4
Take 5 add 1 (5+1 =6) and subtract it to last digit 6 and write before ..4,6-6=0 .....................04
Take 4 subtract it from 5 and write before ....04 5-4 =1 . ......................................................104
Subtract 3 from 4 and write before ...104 4-3 =1 ................................................................1104
Subtract 2 from 3 and write before ..1104 3-2 =1 .............................................................11104
Subtract 1 from 2 and write before..11104 2-1 =1...........................................................111104
Subtract 0 from 1 and write before.111104 1-0 =1 1111104

                                          1111104 is our required answer






                                                              365 x9= ??

0365x9=
10-5 =5 ............5
6+1=7 subtract 7 from 5 , take carry from 6 now 5 become 15 ( 15- 7 =8 ) .......85
Now 6 become 5(adjust carry) subtract 3 from it 5-3 =2 ........285
3-0 =3 3285
3285 is our required answer

I think all of you understand this concept . It is a very useful tool ,with the help of this tool


now we learn multiplication of 36 ,.45 ,54. 63 . 72 ,81 and other multiple of 9

212x36  =  ( 4x9)x212  = 9x(848)      = 7632
212x45  =  (90/2)x212  = 9x(2120/2) =  9x1060  = 9540
43x54    =  (9x6)x43     = 9x(43x6)    = 9x 258    =2322
63x58    =  (9x7)x58     = 9x( 7x58)   = 9x 406   = 3654
72x23    =  (8x9)x23     = 9x(8x23)    = 9x184    = 1656
81 x59   =  (10-1)9 x59 = (590-59)x9 = 531x9    = 4779




Practice Test

2589 x9=           5897 x36 =            569x9=
256x45 =           987x63 =               177 x9=
458x54 =           458x9=                  2597x72=