flipkart app

App

flipkart app

App

flipkart app

App

Saturday, 28 September 2013

Vedic Maths : Lesson 4 (Multiply Easily)

Lesson 4

                                         MULTIPLICATION OF 12 TO 19


MULTIPLICATION BY 12:
The method is exactly the same as in the case of 11 except that you double each number before adding the right neighbor.

Step1     Prefix 0 before multiplicand 

Step2     Multiply last digit by 2 and write it at extreme right take carry if there is

Step3     Double and add the right neighbor with carry in step first repeat this up to the first
               digit i.e till 0

 
1234 x12= 01234x12 =

Here     2 multiply by 4 write 8 at extreme right .                                        ...... 8
Double 3 and add to 4 and write before                                                           ...8
6+4=10 here we write 0 before 8 and take 1 carry                                       .....08
Double 2 and add to 3 and add carry1 and write before 08 ,4 +3 +1 =8    .....808
Double 1 and add to 2 and write before ...808, 2+ 2 =4                            ....4808
Double 0 and add to 1 and write before .4808       0+1=1                           14808

                     14808 is our required answer


MULTIPLICATION FROM 13 TO 19:
The method is exactly the same as in the case of 12 except that you treble each degit before add in the
right neighbor, in the case of multiplication of 13 .We would quadruple (i.e. multiply by 4) and then add the right neighbor, in the case of multiplication of 14 .In case of 19 we would multiply by 9 and then add the right neighbor.

39942 X 13 = ?

 039942x13=
                                2x3 =6 ........................ 6
                                4x3+2 =14 .................46
                                9x3+4+1 =32 ...........246
                                9x3+9+3=39 ..........9246
                                3x3+9+3=21 ........19246
                                0x3+3+2=5........ 519246

                      519246 is our required answer.


34x17 =?             034x17

                               4x7 =28 ...............8
                               3x7+4+2 =27 .....78
                               0x7 +3+2=5..... 578
                    
                          578 is our required answer.

Now try these examples

1) 39942 X 13 = ?           039942 X 13           519246  
2) 43285 X 14 = ?           043285 X 14           605990
3) 58265 X 15 = ?           058265 X 15           873975       
4) 36987 X 16 = ?           036987 X 16           591792
5) 69873 X 17 = ?           069873 X 17           1187841    
6) 96325 X 18 = ?           096325 X 18           1733850
7) 74125 X 19 = ?           074125 X 19

 
 Practice Test

24678 x 13=              246x13x 15=                89x19 x18=
98745 x14=               987 x19 =                     266x16=
98745 x17=               8745x 12 =                   3435 x12=

Check your answer with the help of calculator

No comments:

Post a Comment